EP1800455 - PROXY SMART CARD APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | For all designated states Nokia Inc. 6021 Connection Drive, MS 2-5-520 Irving, TX 75039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Nokia Inc. 6021 Connection Drive MS 2-5-520 Irving, TX 75039 / US | |||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Nokia, Inc. 6000 Connection Drive Irving, TX 75039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAVERINEN, Henry Einonkoja 10 A 3 FIN-40250 Jyväskylä / FI | 02 /
ERONEN, Pasi Neitojenranta 1 B 38 FIN-00810 Helsinki / FI | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05850094.3 | 12.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005IB03051 | Priority number, date | US20040965643 | 14.10.2004 Original published format: US 965643 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006040659 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800455 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/58, G06F9/44, H04Q7/38, G07F7/10 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L63/162 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROXYCHIPKARTEN-ANWENDUNGEN | [2007/26] | English: | PROXY SMART CARD APPLICATIONS | [2007/26] | French: | APPLICATIONS DE CARTES A PUCES MANDATAIRES | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 26.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/21] | 09.01.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002083142 (LAGOSANTO LAURENT [FR], et al); | [P]FR2857207 (ORANGE FRANCE [FR]); | [E]WO2005107166 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) | by applicant | - 3GPP DRAFT, (20031112), pages 3 - 030747 | - 3GPP DRAFT, (20040203), pages 3 - 040048 | - 3GPP DRAFT, pages 3 - 030747 |