EP1866174 - AUXILIARY AIR-CONDITIONING MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÄMER, Wolfgang Stridbeckstrasse 1 81479 München / DE | 02 /
KHELIFA, Noureddine Rosa-Luxemburg-Platz 2 80637 München / DE | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Schumacher, Dirk Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Schumacher, Dirk Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05850152.9 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/51] | WO2005DE02255 | Priority number, date | DE20051001901 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005001901 | [2007/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006074623 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866174 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
B60H1/005 (EP,US);
B60H1/00 (KR);
B60H1/00378 (EP);
B60H1/00978 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STANDKLIMATISIERUNGSMODUL FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2007/51] | English: | AUXILIARY AIR-CONDITIONING MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/51] | French: | MODULE DE CLIMATISATION A L'ARRET POUR UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 29.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.10.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | 26.10.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.10.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   26.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19646504 (BACKHUS FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [Y]US5934092 (KROMPASS ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 12,13,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6260376 (KHELIFA NOUREDDINE [DE], et al); | [XY]FR2824388 (ITALINNOVA SAS [IT]) [X] 1,5-8,14 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15,16; | [A] - SCHMID M ET AL, "STANDKLIMATISIERUNG VON NUTZFAHRZEUGEN", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, VIEWEG PUBLISHING, WIESBADEN, DE, (2000), vol. 102, no. 9, ISSN 0001-2785, pages 694 - 699, XP001158936 |