EP1831669 - HIGH-SENSITIVITY METHOD FOR DETECTING DIFFERENCES BETWEEN THE PHYSICALLY MEASURABLE PROPERTIES OF A SAMPLE AND A REFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENS, Rüdiger Faselwiese 15 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
THIEL, Erwin Wahlbacher Str. 20 57299 Burbach-Gilsbach / DE | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05850316.0 | 21.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP13775 | Priority number, date | DE20041062256 | 23.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062256 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006069695 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831669 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831669 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N17/00, G01J3/50 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G01N17/004 (EP,US);
G01J3/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHEMPFINDLICHES VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON UNTERSCHIEDEN ZWISCHEN DEN PHYSIKALISCH MESSBAREN EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER PROBE UND EINER REFERENZ | [2007/37] | English: | HIGH-SENSITIVITY METHOD FOR DETECTING DIFFERENCES BETWEEN THE PHYSICALLY MEASURABLE PROPERTIES OF A SAMPLE AND A REFERENCE | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE A HAUTE SENSIBILITE DE DETECTION DES DIFFERENCES ENTRE LES PROPRIETES PHYSIQUEMENT MESURABLES D'UN ECHANTILLON ET CELLES D'UNE REFERENCE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 07.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | DK | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | IE | 24.06.2009 | LT | 24.06.2009 | LV | 24.06.2009 | NL | 24.06.2009 | PL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | ES | 05.10.2009 | IS | 24.10.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | AT | 21.12.2009 | LU | 21.12.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
AT | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 21.12.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
LU | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 24.06.2009 | |
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1315318 (SOLVAY) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 4, line 76 - page 5, line 42 *; | [A]EP0908716 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0043] * * figure 1 *; | [PA]WO2005019808 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PA] 1-18* the whole document * |