EP1834277 - METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING BY A DETECTOR OF THE PRESENCE OF CHIP CARDS IN A READER, CHIP CARDS AND A READING DEVICE COMMUNICATING BY THE PRESENCE DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SAS 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SAS 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SAS 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILL, Patrick 15 Rue Du Stade F-35690 Acigne / FR | 02 /
HORR, Olivier 16b Rue De Chateaudun F-35000 Rennes / FR | 03 /
LAUNAY, Philippe 6 Rue Theophile Busnel F-35200 Rennes / FR | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Le Dantec, Claude TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Le Dantec, Claude Thomson European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2007/38] | Le Dantec, Claude 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 05850490.3 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005EP57115 | Priority number, date | FR20050050063 | 07.01.2005 Original published format: FR 0550063 | FR20050050088 | 10.01.2005 Original published format: FR 0550088 | [2007/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006072552 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834277 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834277 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K7/0021 (EP,US);
G06K7/08 (KR);
H04L9/32 (KR);
G06K19/072 (US);
G06K19/07732 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, DURCH DAS EIN DETEKTOR DIE ANWESENHEIT VON CHIPKARTEN IN EINEM LESER ÜBERMITTELT, CHIPKARTEN UND EINE LESEEINRICHTUNG, DIE DURCH DEN PRÄSENZDETEKTOR KOMMUNIZIEREN | [2007/38] | English: | METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING BY A DETECTOR OF THE PRESENCE OF CHIP CARDS IN A READER, CHIP CARDS AND A READING DEVICE COMMUNICATING BY THE PRESENCE DETECTOR | [2007/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION PAR UN DETECTEUR DE PRESENCE DE CARTES A PUCES DANS UN LECTEUR, CARTES A PUCES ET APPAREIL LECTEUR COMMUNIQUANT PAR LE DETECTEUR DE PRESENCE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9814916 (COVELEY MICHAEL [CA]) [A] 1,5,15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19542262 (FISCHER COMPUTERSYSTEME GMBH & [DE]) [A] 1,5,15 * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 9 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6216955 (LE ROUX JEAN YVES [FR], et al) [A] 1,5,15 * column 4, line 6 - line 26 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0858046 (OKI AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1,5,15 * figure 8 *; | [A]US5912618 (MAUGARS PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1,5,15 * figure 2 * |