EP1831390 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF CEFACLOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM Sinochem Pharmaceuticals Netherlands B.V. Alexander Fleminglaan 1 2613 AX Delft / NL | [2012/04] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOODY, Harold, Monro Akelei 9 NL-6271 ED Gulpen / NL | 02 /
DOOREN, VAN, Theodorus, Johannes, Godfried, Maria Henri Tijssenstraat 56 NL-6042 BZ Roermond / NL | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | De Vroom, Erik, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Misset, Onno, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | ||
Former [2011/11] | Misset, Onno, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 130 6100 AC Echt / NL | ||
Former [2007/37] | Misset, Onno DSM Intellectual Property Office Delft PP 600-0240 P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 05850496.0 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP57155 | Priority number, date | EP20040106999 | 27.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04106999 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006069984 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1831390 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831390 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12P35/04, C12P37/04 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C12P35/04 (EP,US);
C12P17/16 (KR);
A61K31/545 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D501/58 (EP,US);
C12P35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON CEFACLOR | [2007/37] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF CEFACLOR | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDÉ POUR LA SYNTHÈSE DU CEFACLOR | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2005 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | IE | 23.12.2014 | LU | 23.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | FR | 19.01.2015 | GB | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.12.2005 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 19.01.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]EP0730035 (ACS DOBFAR SPA [IT]) [XD] 1-4 * abstract * * page 3, line 67 - line 68 * * claim 1 *[Y] 5-8,15; | [AD]WO9820120 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [AD] 5-8 * abstract * * page 8, line 21 - line 34 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO03055998 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [Y] 5-8,15 * abstract * * page 10, line 12 - line 31 * * page 17, line 1 - line 6 * |