21.11.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
31.07.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.01.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
19.04.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.02.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
25.01.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
10.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
17.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
14.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|