EP1828688 - A DEVICE FOR RECOVERY OF FLUE-GAS HEAT OF A DOMESTIC BOILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groppalli S.r.l. Loc. Pilastro di Gragnanino 29010 Gragnano Trebbiense (PC) / IT | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROPPALLI, Luciano Via Cremona, 46 29010 Agazzano / IT | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05850679.1 | 01.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005IB03630 | Priority number, date | IT2004BG00046 | 02.12.2004 Original published format: IT BG20040046 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006059215 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828688 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F24D12/02, F28F1/16, F28D7/10, F28D7/12, F23J15/06 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F28D7/12 (EP);
F23J15/06 (EP);
F24H9/0084 (EP);
F28D21/0007 (EP);
F28D7/103 (EP);
F28F1/022 (EP);
F28F1/16 (EP);
F23J2211/101 (EP);
F23J2900/13004 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON RAUCHGASWÄRME EINES HAUSHEIZUNGSKESSELS | [2007/36] | English: | A DEVICE FOR RECOVERY OF FLUE-GAS HEAT OF A DOMESTIC BOILER | [2007/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECUPERATION DE LA CHALEUR DE GAZ DE COMBUSTION D'UNE CHAUDIERE DOMESTIQUE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2116299 (JACKSON JOHN BARRY) [X] 1-3,6,16-18,41 * the whole document * [Y] 4,7-15,19-33,40; | [Y]EP1469254 (UBBINK NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1245902 (UBBINK NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [Y] 7-15 * abstract *; | [Y]NL75608C (ANDRÉ HUET) [Y] 19 * figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH0988731 ; | [Y]WO03085344 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al) [Y] 20,22,23,25-27,29,30 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9700786 (EBERSPAECHER J [DE], et al) [Y] 24,28 * page 6; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE9100961U (ING. ROLF SEIFERT ELECTRONIC GMBH, 5828 ENNEPETAL, DE) [Y] 30-33,40 * the whole document *; | [X]US3916991 (TRUMP GEORGE S) [X] 1,3,16-18,41 * abstract *; | [A]DE19818521 (CENTROTHERM ABGASTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 8-15; | [A]DE29708140U (HOEFER HENDRIK [DE]) [A] 1-41 * page 13; figures 1,5 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09088731 A 19970331 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [Y] 21 * abstract * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Water vapor transfer profile designs", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200408), vol. 484, no. 78, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007134214 [A] 32 |