EP1831760 - OPTOELECTRONIC POSITION DETERMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUHANEN, Petteri Lahnatie 14 D 7 FIN-02170 Espoo / FI | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05850715.3 | 26.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005IB03892 | Priority number, date | US20040023233 | 27.12.2004 Original published format: US 23233 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006070263 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831760 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831760 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03B3/02, G01D5/34, G02B7/04 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
G01D5/28 (EP,US);
G01D5/34 (EP,US);
G01D5/347 (EP,US);
G02B7/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/37] | G03B3/02, G01D5/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2008/14] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHES POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/37] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC POSITION DETERMINATION SYSTEM | [2007/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETERMINATION DE POSITION OPTOELECTRONIQUE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 26.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.04.2011 | NL | 20.04.2011 | GB | 26.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/32] |
Former [2013/19] | NL | 20.04.2011 | |
GB | 26.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | NL | 20.04.2011 | |
GB | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | NL | 20.04.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003247864 (MITUTOYO CORP); | [A]JP2001194111 (KAIJO KK); | [A]JPH07146113 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO); | [A]JPS60218006 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPS56130603 (RICOH KK); | [A]US6586719 (BARTZKE KARLHEINZ [DE], et al); | [A]US6459492 (HERCHER MICHAEL [US]) | by applicant | US6710950 | US2003227560 | US7212358 | US5859733 | US5587846 | US5391866 | US6586719 |