EP1963707 - DRIVE BELT AND METHOD FOR FORMING A TRANSVERSE ELEMENT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTSAERS, Robert, Arnoldus, Andreas Durendaaldreef 25 5062 LV Oisterwijk / NL | 02 /
FEIJTEL, Jasper Gravensingel 219 3319 EV Dordrecht / NL | 03 /
PASTEUNING, Jan, Willem, Nicolaas Bordeslaan 265 5223 ML 's Hertogenbosch / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
MUTSAERS, Robert, Arnoldus, Andreas Bijgaart 29 NL-5061 DH Oisterwijk / NL | ||
02 /
FEIJTEL, Jasper Gravensingel 219 NL-3319 EV Dordrecht / NL | |||
03 /
PASTEUNING, Jan, Willem, Nicolaas Bordeslaan 265 NL-5223 ML 's Hertogenbosch / NL | Representative(s) | Plevier, Gabriël Anton Johan Maria Bosch Transmission Technology B.V. PO Box 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Plevier, Gabriel Anton Johan Maria Bosch Transmission Technology B.V. PO Box 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | ||
Former [2008/36] | Plevier, Gabriel Anton Johan Maria Van Doorne's Transmissie b.v. Patent Department (GS-CT/NE-IP) Postbus 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | Application number, filing date | 05851041.3 | 15.12.2005 | [2008/36] | WO2005NL00859 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007069883 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1963707 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1963707 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/16 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F16G5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | TREIBRIEMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN EINES QUERELEMENTS DAVON | [2008/36] | English: | DRIVE BELT AND METHOD FOR FORMING A TRANSVERSE ELEMENT THEREOF | [2008/36] | French: | COURROIE D'ENTRAINEMENT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT TRANSVERSAL | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2005 | AT | 28.11.2012 | BE | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | IT | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SE | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | IE | 15.12.2012 | LU | 15.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | ES | 11.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 15.12.2005 | |
AT | 28.11.2012 | ||
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 15.12.2012 | ||
LU | 15.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 15.12.2012 | ||
LU | 15.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 15.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 15.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 15.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO2004036083 (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL], et al) [DX] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1424508 (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]) [A] 5,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0269270 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1a-2d * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 11 *; | [A]JP2002213539 ; | [A]EP1061285 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0021] , [0027]; figures 3,6 *; | [A]JPS61103028 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021106), vol. 2002, no. 11, & JP2002213539 A 20020731 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860927), vol. 010, no. 286, Database accession no. (M - 521), & JP61103028 A 19860521 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2004036083 |