EP1809479 - GRAVURE CYLINDER PATCH COATING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOBO, Rukmini Bezbaruah 51 Scarborough Park Rochester, New York 14625 / US | 02 /
HEETDERKS, James P. 864 Buttermilk Circle Webster, New York 14580 / US | 03 /
WAKEFIELD, David A. 84 Arlington Park Canandaigua, New York 14424 / US | 04 /
BEAM, Roger D. 2887 Gaines Road Albion, New York 14411 / US | 05 /
HILL, Mikel S. 39 Amann Road Honeoye Falls, New York 14472 / US | 06 /
BENTZ, Alan R. 1760 Reed Road Bergen, New York 14416 / US | 07 /
CHRIST, Charles S. Christ 29 Country Club Drive Rochester, New York 14618 / US | 08 /
SCHULTZ, Ralph P. 19 Falling Creek Road Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2007/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W93-2), Headstone Drive, Harrow Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05851284.9 | 01.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005US39421 | Priority number, date | US20040988242 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 988242 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006055235 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1809479 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/50, B05C1/08, B05C1/16 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
B41F9/028 (EP,US);
B05C1/165 (EP,US);
B05C1/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/08] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PATCH-BESCHICHTUNG MIT EINEM TIEFDRUCKZYLINDER | [2007/30] | English: | GRAVURE CYLINDER PATCH COATING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2007/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DEPOT D'UNE COUCHE DE RENFORT AU MOYEN DE CYLINDRES | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03114564 ; | [A]US3762319 (FOOTE C, et al) [A] 1,8,14,20* the whole document *; | [A]EP0646458 (MESCHI IND GRAFICA [IT]) [A] 1,8,14,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5582868 (HARADA YOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,14,20 * figure 12 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910806), vol. 015, no. 306, Database accession no. (C - 0856), & JP03114564 A 19910515 (YASUI SEIKI:KK) [A] 1,8,14,20 * abstract * | by applicant | US1096483 | US3762319 | US3936549 | US4305332 | US4373443 | JPH03114564 | US5426588 | US6272986 |