Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
30.12.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.10.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.09.2011 | Change - representative | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
04.02.2011 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
29.11.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.12.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
09.09.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.01.2008 | Change - extension states | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
05.09.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
13.07.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
11.07.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.06.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.02.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.05.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.05.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.04.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication |