EP1816987 - TISSUE SCAFFOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proxy Biomedical Limited Unit 6D, Mervue Business Park Galway / IE | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINGRAS, Peter 40 Hazelwood Court Taylors Hill Galway / IE | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/42] | Roche, Dermot, et al Roche Patents 69 Burnaby Heights, Greystones Wicklow / IE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Roche, Dermot, et al John A, O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, County Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 05851604.8 | 09.11.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005US41157 | Priority number, date | IE20040000751 | 09.11.2004 Original published format: IE 20040751 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006053291 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1816987 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61F2/00 (US);
A61F2/08 (EP,US);
A61F2/105 (US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
A61L27/16 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B37/153 (US);
B32B38/0008 (US);
B32B38/04 (US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61F2/3872 (EP,US);
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0086 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30011 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30032 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30113 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30125 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30148 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30154 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30224 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30225 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30228 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30762 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30766 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3093 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30952 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30971 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4648 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0017 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0021 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2240/001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0023 (EP,US);
A61F2250/003 (EP,US);
B32B2038/042 (US);
B32B2038/047 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2535/00 (US);
Y10T156/1056 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBEGERÜST | [2007/33] | English: | TISSUE SCAFFOLD | [2007/33] | French: | EMPILEMENT DE TISSUS | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 17.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2003004578 (BROWN KELLY R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0019] , [0020] , [0028] , [0050] , [0055] , [0060] , [0062] , [0066]; figure 2 * [A] 5 | International search | [X]EP1277450 ; | [Y]WO2004006808 ; | [A]EP1028774 ; | [A]EP1493404 ; | [A]US6626950 ; | [A]US2002142413 ; | [A]US2003065400 ; | [A]WO2004078954 ; | [A]US2004203147 ; | [A]US4661458 ; | [A]US2002182241 ; | [A]US6103255 |