EP1827659 - DIALYSIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linden Technologies, Inc. 35 Cabot Road Woburn MA 01801 / US | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Tai-Nang 67 Sherburne Road South Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05851782.2 | 17.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US41771 | Priority number, date | US20040629000P | 18.11.2004 Original published format: US 629000 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006055756 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1827659 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/06, B01D61/28, B01L3/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B01D61/28 (EP,US);
B01D61/30 (EP,US);
B01D63/06 (EP,US);
B01L3/50255 (EP,US);
G01N13/00 (EP,US);
B01D2313/2061 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0472 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | B01D63/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIALYSEVORRICHTUNG | [2007/36] | English: | DIALYSIS DEVICE | [2007/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIALYSE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3682817 (MARX GUNTER H); | [A]WO03049841 (CYBIO AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2004195163 (WATZELE MANFRED [DE], et al) | International search | [X]US3672509 (BUCHMANN PAUL, et al); | [X]US4124509 (IIJIMA SEIICHI, et al); | [Y]US5230796 (TER MEULEN BEREND P [NL]); | [Y]US2003213740 (CREASEY ANDREW [US]) |