EP1828833 - Wireless interactive headset [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | WIRELESS INTERACTIVE HEADSET | ||
[2015/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OAKLEY, INC. One Icon Foothill Ranch California 92610 / US | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANNARD, James, H. Box 1389 Spieden Island Eastsound, WA 98245 / US | 02 /
REYES, Carlos 7 Via Silla Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | 03 /
BADEN, Colin 5 Redonda Irvine, CA 92620 / US | 04 /
BRUNS, Summer, Lane 121 Granville Avenue Annapolis, MD 21401 / US | [2015/34] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
JANNARD, James, H. Box 1389, Spieden Island Eastsound, WA 98245 / US | ||
02 /
REYES, Carlos 7 Via Silla Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | |||
03 /
BADEN, Colin 5 Redonda Irvine, CA 92620 / US | |||
04 /
BRUNS, Summer, Lane 121 Granville Avenue Annapolis, MD 21401 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05851915.8 | 18.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US42084 | Priority number, date | US20040993217 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: US 993217 | US20040022367 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 22367 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006055884 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828833 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828833 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02C11/00, H04R1/10, // H04R5/033 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H04R1/1066 (EP);
H04R5/033 (KR);
G02C1/00 (KR);
G02C11/10 (EP);
H04R1/10 (KR);
H04R5/0335 (EP);
H04R1/1008 (EP);
H04R1/1041 (EP);
H04R1/105 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | G02C1/00, H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drahtloser interaktiver Kopfhörer | [2015/12] | English: | Wireless interactive headset | [2015/12] | French: | Casque d'écoute interactif sans fil | [2015/12] |
Former [2007/36] | DRAHTLOSES INTERAKTIVES KOPFGESCHIRR | ||
Former [2007/36] | WIRELESS INTERACTIVE HEADSET | ||
Former [2007/36] | CASQUE D'ECOUTE INTERACTIF SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 19.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2005 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | IE | 18.11.2015 | LU | 18.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US5335285 (GLUZ JACOB [CA]) [I] 1-11,32-38,59-66,69 * the whole document * [Y] 12-31,39-58,67,68,70-74; | [Y]WO2004012477 (OAKLEY INC [US]) [Y] 12-31,39-58,67,68,70-74 * the whole document *; | [A]US4902120 (WEYER FRANK M [US]) [A] 1-74 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5335285 (GLUZ JACOB [CA]); | [Y]US6311155 (VAUDREY MICHAEL A [US], et al) | by applicant | US5335285 | WO2004012477 |