EP1819307 - FASTENING TAB AND SIDE PANEL OF DISPOSABLE DIAPER AND DISPOSABLE DIAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Tatsuya, Sumitomo 3m Limited 33-1, Tamagawadai, 2-chome Setagaya, Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 02 /
KONO, Yasuhiro, Sumitomo 3m Limited 33-1, Tamagawadai, 2-chome Setagaya, Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Takeshi, Sumitomo 3m Limited 33-1, Tamagawadai, 2-chome Setagaya, Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 04 /
SETH, Jayshree, 3m Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05853206.0 | 06.12.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005US44219 | Priority number, date | JP20040354080 | 07.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004354080 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006063029 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1819307 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/56, A61F13/58, A61F13/60, A61F13/15 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A61F13/581 (EP,US);
A61F13/15756 (EP,US);
A61F13/5644 (EP,US);
A61F13/58 (EP,US);
A61F13/60 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5677 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5694 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSLASCHE UND SEITENFELD EINER WEGWERFWINDEL SOWIE WEGWERFWINDEL | [2007/34] | English: | FASTENING TAB AND SIDE PANEL OF DISPOSABLE DIAPER AND DISPOSABLE DIAPER | [2007/34] | French: | LANGUETTE DE FIXATION ET PANNEAU LATERAL DE COUCHE JETABLE, ET COUCHE JETABLE CORRESPONDANTE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 15.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1159945 (FIRST QUALITY ENTPR INC [US]) [X] 1,3,12-14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] * * paragraph [0039]; figures 3,4,7 *; | [Y]US2002045871 (GANDEMO TOMAS [SE]) [Y] 2,4,7-9,15,16 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] *; | [XY]US2003018315 (POPP ROBERT LEE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14 * paragraphs [0095] - [0114]; figures 14,15,22 * [Y] 2,4,7-9,15,16; | [A]US2003088220 (MOLANDER JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 3* paragraph [0056] * |