04.07.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.08.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.04.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2011 |
First examination report |
|
02.09.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
02.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
02.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
04.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2010 |
Change - name/address |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
06.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
08.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
17.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
17.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
14.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|