EP1833666 - COATED ARTICLE WITH LOW-E COATING INCLUDING IR REFLECTING LAYER(S) AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES CORP. 2300 Harmon Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1714 / US | For all designated states Centre Luxembourgeois de Recherches pour le Verre et la Céramique S.A. (C.R.V.C.) Zone Industrielle Wolser 3452 Dudelange / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES CORP. 2300 Harmon Road, Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-1714 / US | ||
For all designated states Centre Luxembourgeois de Recherches pour le Verre et la Ceramique S.A. (C.R.V.C.) Zone Industrielle Wolser 3452 Dudelange / LU | |||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES CORP. 2300 Harmon Road, Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-1714 / US | ||
For all designated states Centre Luxembourgeois de Recherches pour le Verre Et la Ceramique S.A. (C.R.V.C.) Zone Industrielle Wolser 3452 Dudelange / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, Jens-Peter 38, rue Belair L-4514 Differdange / LU | 02 /
THOMSEN, Scott 9017 Stoney Creek Drive South Lyon, Michigan 48178 / US | 03 /
LEMMER, Jean-marc 45, Rue Glesener L-1631Luxembourg / LU | 04 /
FERREIRA, Jose 52 Cite Kirchberg L-3733 Rumelange / LU | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
MULLER, Jens-Peter 38, rue Belair L-4514 Differdange / LU | ||
02 /
THOMSEN, Scott 9017 Stoney Creek Drive South Lyon, Michigan 48178 / US | |||
03 /
LEMMER, Jean-marc 71 Rte de Luxembourg L-7373 Lorentzweiler / LU | |||
04 /
FERREIRA, Jose 52 Cite Kirchberg L-3733 Rumelange / LU | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Hess, Peter K. G. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05853419.9 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005US44491 | Priority number, date | US20040008644 | 10.12.2004 Original published format: US 8644 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006063171 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1833666 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/36 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3618 (EP,US);
C03C17/3626 (EP,US);
C03C17/3639 (EP,US);
C03C17/3644 (EP,US);
C03C17/3652 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | B32B17/06, C23C16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL MIT LOW-E-BESCHICHTUNG MIT IR-REFLEXIONSSCHICHT(EN) UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2007/38] | English: | COATED ARTICLE WITH LOW-E COATING INCLUDING IR REFLECTING LAYER(S) AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2007/38] | French: | ARTICLE REVETU PAR UN REVETEMENT A FAIBLE EMISSIVITE COMPRENANT UNE OU PLUSIEURS COUCHES DE REFLEXION IR ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6055088 (FIX RENAUD [FR], et al) [X] 20,21 * column 15, line 65 - column 16, line 17 *; | [X]WO0037381 (GLAVERBEL [BE], et al) [X] 20,21 * page 5, lines 3-7; example 1 *; | [X]US2003104221 (STACHOWIAK GRZEGORZ [US]) [X] 20,21* paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *; | [X]US6586102 (STACHOWIAK GRZEGORZ [US]) [X] 20,21 * column 4, lines 10-15; figure 2; claims 1,, 8 *; | [X]US2004058169 (WANG HONG [US], et al) [X] 20,21 * paragraph [0035]; figure 3 *; | [ED]EP1784303 (CT LUXEMBOURGEOIS RECH VERRE [LU], et al) [ED] 20,21 * figure 1; claim 43 *; | [E]EP1817163 (GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES [US], et al) [E] 20,21 * figure 1; claim 43 * | International search | [X]US5993950 (NOVIS YVAN [BE], et al); | [Y]US2004005467 (NEUMAN GEORGE [US], et al); | [Y]US2003150711 (LAIRD RONALD E [US]) |