EP1829293 - COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH SEGMENTING AND FRAMING OF SEGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exar Corporation 48720 Kato Road Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Exar Corporation 48720 Kato Road Fremont, California 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUONG, Khai, Hoan 26700 Havenhill Lane Los Gatos, California 95033 / US | 02 /
HOMER, Russell 2344 Cascade Street Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05854182.2 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US45413 | Priority number, date | US20040021520 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 21520 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006068913 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1829293 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
H04L47/36 (EP,US);
H04L12/427 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/13 (EP,US);
H04L47/43 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04J3/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/14] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT SEGMENTIERUNG UND FRAGMENTIERUNG VON SEGMENTEN | [2007/36] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH SEGMENTING AND FRAMING OF SEGMENTS | [2007/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AVEC SEGMENTATION ET MISE EN TRAME DE SEGMENTS | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 25.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0874530 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,13,19,24 * column 6, line 20 - line 41; figure 6 *; | [A]US6396853 (HUMPHREY LESLIE DEREK [GB], et al) [A] 6,22,29 * column 1, line 41 - line 53 * * column 5, line 34 - line 59 * * column 8, line 1 - line 31 * * column 10, line 35 - line 53 * * column 8, line 41 - line 45 ** figures 2-4,6,8 *; | [A]US2002126704 (CAM RICHARD [CA], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0007] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0068] * * figures 6,7 *; | [I]WO03005763 (TRANSWITCH CORP [US]) [I] 1-29 * page 12, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph l * * figures 8a,9 *; | [A]WO03067843 (WUHAN FIBERHOME NETWORKS CO LT [CN], et al) [A] 1,13,18,19,24 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5796735 (MILLER MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [X]US2002041592 (VAN DER ZEE MARTIN [NL], et al); | [A]US2002080821 (HWANG DAE-HWAN [KR]) |