EP1819325 - DEVICE FOR OPHTHALMIC DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hunenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOWAN, Masood, A. 3521 Lake Tahoe Arlington, TX 76016 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05854222.6 | 15.12.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005US45459 | Priority number, date | US20040638775P | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 638775 P | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006068921 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1819325 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/19 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/0051 (EP,US);
A61F9/00 (KR);
A61F2/14 (KR);
A61K9/0097 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | A61K9/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERABREICHUNG OPHTHALMISCHER ARZNEIMITTEL | [2007/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR OPHTHALMIC DRUG DELIVERY | [2007/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION D'UN MEDICAMENT OPHTALMIQUE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 18.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4949874 (FIEDLER JUERGEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2004064102 (YAMADA AKIRA [US]); | [Y]US6413245 (YAACOBI YOSEPH [US], et al) |