EP1834174 - DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM FOR DETECTING RUPTURE OR THINNING OF DIAPHRAGMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Inc. 8200 Market Boulevard Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | [2013/51] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Rosemount, Inc. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, William, Thomas 1561 Heron Drive Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | 02 /
WELLS, Christopher, Ashley 17271 Acorn Ridge Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05854450.3 | 15.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005US45734 | Priority number, date | US20050031953 | 07.01.2005 Original published format: US 31953 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006073752 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834174 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834174 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/24, H05K7/14 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
G01N27/24 (EP,US);
G01L27/007 (EP,US);
H05K7/1462 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | G01N27/24 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2017/25] |
Former [2008/07] | CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DIAGNOSESYSTEM ZUM NACHWEIS DES REISSENS ODER DÜNNERWERDENS VON DIAPHRAGMEN | [2007/38] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM FOR DETECTING RUPTURE OR THINNING OF DIAPHRAGMS | [2007/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIAGNOSTIC DESTINE A DETECTER LA RUPTURE OU L'AMINCISSEMENT DE MEMBRANES | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 08.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2018/51] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS61237053 ; | [A]US3353025 (WALTER STURM) [A] 34* column 4, line 26 - line 32 *; | [A]US3946726 (PIKUL RICHARD E) [A] 2,14,15,26 * column 11, line 25 - line 67 *; | [X]BE893660 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE) [X] 1,12,23 * page 3 - page 5; figure 1 *; | [X]US6577140 (WENMAN RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-35 * column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 35 * * column 14, line 60 - column 15, line 20 * * column 12, line 54 - line 59 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870311), vol. 011, no. 079, Database accession no. (P - 555), & JP61237053 A 19861022 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP | Examination | JP2002156301 |