EP1838288 - THERAPEUTIC MATERIALS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 26 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states ARIAD Pharmaceuticals, Inc 26 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS, INC. 26 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLACKSON, Timothy, P. 21 Kensington Park Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 02 /
BEDROSIAN, Camille, L. 22 Lantern Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05854727.4 | 20.12.2005 | [2007/40] | WO2005US46065 | Priority number, date | US20040638054P | 20.12.2004 Original published format: US 638054 P | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006069038 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1838288 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/445, A61K31/4545, A61K31/4745 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | A61K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE STOFFE UND VERFAHREN | [2007/40] | English: | THERAPEUTIC MATERIALS AND METHODS | [2007/40] | French: | MATERIELS ET PROCEDES THERAPEUTIQUES | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 07.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 03.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9117754 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-19 * * example 2 *; | [XY]WO9855090 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US5871753 (CRABTREE GERALD R [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-35 *; | [A]US6458777 (SONIS STEPHEN T [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 1,2 ** claims 1-7 * | International search | [A]US5192773 (ARMISTEAD DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US6384046 (SCHULER WALTER [DE], et al) |