EP1836201 - PYRROLIDINE INHIBITORS OF IAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. MS49, 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Frederick 2001 McAllister Street, Apartment No. 143 San Francisco, California 94118 / US | 02 /
FLYGARE, John, A. 650 Chestnut Street, Apartment No. 108 San Francisco, California 94133 / US | 03 /
LY, Cuong 45 Westdale Avenue Daly City, California 94015 / US | 04 /
TSUI, Vickie Hsiao-wei 1419 Vancouver Avenue Burlingame, California 94010 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/39] | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05854815.7 | 19.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005US46161 | Priority number, date | US20040638202P | 20.12.2004 Original published format: US 638202 P | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006069063 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836201 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836201 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1836201 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D417/14, A61K31/427, A61P35/00 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,KR,NO,US);
A61K31/427 (KR,NO);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | 16.07.2007 | BA | 16.07.2007 | HR | 16.07.2007 | MK | 16.07.2007 | YU | 16.07.2007 | Title | German: | PYRROLIDINE ALS INHIBITOREN VON IAP | [2007/39] | English: | PYRROLIDINE INHIBITORS OF IAP | [2007/39] | French: | INHIBITEURS DES IAP DERIVES DE LA PYRROLIDINE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2011
17.05.2011
ADMISSIBLE Naefe, Jan Robert Immelmannstrasse 16 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Oberdorfer, Jürgen nospat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2011
Naefe, Jan Robert Immelmannstrasse 16 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE Opponent's representative Oberdorfer, Jürgen nospat Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | 16.06.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.04.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.07.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.2013 | Appeal received No. T0452/13 | 11.04.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.08.2010 | CZ | 11.08.2010 | EE | 11.08.2010 | FI | 11.08.2010 | LT | 11.08.2010 | LV | 11.08.2010 | PL | 11.08.2010 | RO | 11.08.2010 | SI | 11.08.2010 | SK | 11.08.2010 | TR | 11.08.2010 | BG | 11.11.2010 | GR | 12.11.2010 | IS | 11.12.2010 | PT | 13.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | HU | 12.02.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/12] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
TR | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 12.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 11.08.2010 | |
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 11.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004005248 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005097791 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-21* pages 95-98 *; | [Y] - LIN LI ET AL., "A small molecule Smac mimic potentiates TRAIL- and TNFalpha-mediated cell death", SCIENCE, (20040903), vol. 305, no. 5689, pages 1471 - 1474, XP002377313 [Y] 1-21 * compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1095019 |