Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009104594 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81317805 | 22.12.2005 | US63981604 | 29.12.2004 | WO2005US46545 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008526203 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US63981604 | 29.12.2004 | WO2005US46545 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005322159 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63981604 | 29.12.2004 | WO2005US46545 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1844138 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US63981604 | 29.12.2004 | WO2005US46545 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2593374 | 06.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63981604 | 29.12.2004 | WO2005US46545 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006071716 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2009 | A3 | WO2006071716 | 06.07.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US63981604 | 29.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101443444 | 27.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US63981604 | 29.12.2004 |