EP1844138 - BIOREACTOR PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA, Inc. 15 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, Marcus 12107 Travertine Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855154.0 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/42] | WO2005US46545 | Priority number, date | US20040639816P | 29.12.2004 Original published format: US 639816 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006071716 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844138 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/02, C12M1/00, C12M3/00 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
C12M41/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | C12N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | 27.07.2007 | BA | 27.07.2007 | HR | 27.07.2007 | MK | 27.07.2007 | YU | 27.07.2007 | Title | German: | BIOREAKTORPROZESSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2007/42] | English: | BIOREACTOR PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2007/42] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS DE BIOREACTEUR | [2008/52] |
Former [2007/42] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS DE BIORÉACTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5827701 (LUEKING DONALD R [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * , column 2, lines 22-26; column 6, lines 20-67; column 7, lines 1-10, 27-32, 59-62. *; | [X]US2004033975 (FU PENGCHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * , paragraphs [0034], [0043]. *; | [X]US3857757 (HERRICK C, et al) [X] 1-4, 6-9, 11- 16, 18, 19, 30, 32 * , column 3, lines 19-68; column 4, lines 1-6. * |