EP1828948 - MEMORY SYSTEM WITH IN-STREAM DATA ENCRYPTION/DECRYPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 601 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | For all designated states Discretix Technologies Ltd. 43 HAMELACHA ST., ETGARIM BLDG. Poleg Industrial Zone 8718 Netanya / IL | [2012/06] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 601 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | ||
For all designated states Discretix Technologies Ltd. 43 HAMELACHA ST., ETGARIM BLDG. Poleg Industrial Zone 8718 Netanya / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLTZMAN, Michael 7602 Barnhart Place Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
COHEN, Baruch Boris Aya 15 21721 Carmiel / IL | 03 /
DEITCHER, David Mapu 6 Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
BAR-EL, Hagai Druyan 4 76574 Rehovot / IL | 05 /
YERUCHAMI, Aviram Havazelet Hasharon 12 Ksar Saba / IL | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Prock, Thomas, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Prock, Thomas, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855187.0 | 21.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US46586 | Priority number, date | US20040639442P | 21.12.2004 Original published format: US 639442 P | US20050314030 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: US 314030 | US20050314032 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: US 314032 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006071725 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828948 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828948 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
G06F21/78 (EP);
H04L9/32 (KR);
G06F12/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | SPEICHERSYSTEM MIT IN-STREAM-DATENVERSCHLÜSSELUNG/-ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG | [2007/36] | English: | MEMORY SYSTEM WITH IN-STREAM DATA ENCRYPTION/DECRYPTION | [2007/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE MEMOIRE AVEC CHIFFREMENT/DECHIFFREMENT DE DONNEES DANS LE DEBIT | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10177325.7 / EP2278518 | EP10182649.3 / EP2330530 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2005 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 08.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1074906 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,11,21,22,32 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002174337 (AIHARA TADAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,11,21,22,32 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002188812 (SADHASIVAN AKILA [US], et al) [A] 41-51 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003085289 (KANEKO YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003196028 (MAEDA TAKUJI [JP], et al) [A] 41-51 * the whole document *; | [A]US6754765 (CHANG CHAO-I [US], et al) [A] 41-51* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1074906 | US6457126 |