EP1829346 - PHONE LINE SUPERVISORY CONTROLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2013/27] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states AOL LLC 22000 AOL Way Dulles VA 20166-9323 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNES, Michaela 5125 Manning Drive Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
MURPHY, Stephen, Vaughan 43561 Coal Bed Ct Ashburn, VA 20147 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855337.1 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US46754 | Priority number, date | US20040018925 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 18925 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006069303 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1829346 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M3/38, H04M3/436, H04M3/20 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
H04M3/38 (EP,US);
H04M15/06 (EP,US);
H04M3/20 (EP,US);
H04M3/436 (EP,US);
H04M3/42136 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | H04M3/20, H04M1/66, H04M3/42, H04M3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEFONLEITUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSSTEUERUNGEN | [2007/36] | English: | PHONE LINE SUPERVISORY CONTROLS | [2007/36] | French: | COMMANDES DE SUPERVISION DE LIGNE TELEPHONIQUE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 06.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5363435 (DEMUYNCK NOEL [BF]) [X] 46 * column 1, line 21 - line 37 * * column 2, line 34 - line 61 *[I] 47-60; | [X]US6418216 (HARRISON COLIN GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 46-60 * abstract * * figures 7A,7B, 8,10 *; | [X]WO2004077797 (BOSTON COMMUNICATIONS GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2005034560 (GIAVOTTO CHRISTOPHER PAUL [GB]) [XP] 1-45 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5802157 (CLARKE GAIL L [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2004077797 |