Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7440562 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2008 | B2 | US2007297594 | 27.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1892504 | 22.12.2004 | US84761007 | 30.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1829346 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | A4 | EP1829346 | 05.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US46754 | 22.12.2005 | US1892504 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006069303 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2006069303 | 29.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US1892504 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7289617 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2007 | B2 | US2006146701 | 06.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1892504 | 22.12.2004 |