EP1828346 - PROCESSING OF DIFFERENT FEEDS IN A FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | PROCESSING OF DIFFERENT FEEDS IN A FLUID CATALYTIS CRACKING UNIT | ||
[2012/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lummus Technology Inc. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield NJ 07003-3096 / US | [2013/12] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Lummus Technology Inc. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield NJ 07003-3096 / US | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states ABB LUMMUS GLOBAL INC. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield New Jersey 07003-3096 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONI, Dalip, S. 7707 Knolls Lodge Court Houston, TX 77095 / US | 02 /
CASTAGNOS, Leonce, F. 205 Forest Wind Circle Montgomery, TX 77316 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Giovannini, Francesca, et al Osha Liang 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [2012/04] |
Former [2012/03] | Brochard, Pascale Osha Liang Sarl 32 Avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/01] | Serjeants 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59 68520 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05855354.6 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US46778 | Priority number, date | US20040021274 | 23.12.2004 Original published format: US 21274 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006071771 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828346 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828346 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, B01J8/18, B01J8/24, B01J8/38 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B01J8/388 (EP,US);
C10G11/18 (KR);
B01J8/18 (KR);
B01J8/1818 (EP,US);
B01J8/1827 (EP,US);
B01J8/1863 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON VERSCHIEDENEN EINSPEISUNGEN IN EINER ANLAGE ZUM FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING | [2013/11] | English: | PROCESSING OF DIFFERENT FEEDS IN A FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING UNIT | [2012/42] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DIFFERENTES CHARGES DANS UNE UNITE DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE FLUIDE | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/36] | VERARBEITUNG VON VERSCHIEDENEN ZUFÜHRUNGEN IN EINER FLUID-CATALYTIC-CRACKING-EINHEIT | ||
Former [2007/36] | PROCESSING OF DIFFERENT FEEDS IN A FLUID CATALYTIS CRACKING UNIT | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2005 | AT | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | ES | 01.07.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | IE | 22.12.2013 | LU | 22.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0259153 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,14-16,21,22 * page 4, line 62 - page 5, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4832825 (MAULEON JEAN-LOUIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,12,13,16,21-23 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, lines 23-41 * * column 6, lines 13-59 * * column 8, lines 23-27; figure 1B *; | [X]EP0323297 (TOTAL FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,4-6,12,13,16,21-23 * column 8, lines 31-65; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0849347 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1-4,11,13,16,21,22 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 39 *; | [A]EP1013743 (INDIAN OIL CORP LTD [IN]); | [X]US6126813 (FERSING MARC [FR], et al) [X] 17,25 * column 8, lines 39-44; figure 2 * * column 9, lines 9-27 *; | [A]US6613290 (SENIOR RICHARD C [US]) |