EP1827464 - ZINC-BASED COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swiss-American CDMO, LLC. 2055 Luna Road, Suite 126 Carrollton TX 75006 / US | [2017/43] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Swiss-American Products, Inc. 2055 Luna Road, Suite 126 Dallas TX 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLING, William, O. 2055 Luna Road, Suite 126 Dallas, Texas 75006 / US | 02 /
PARNELL, Laura, K. S. 6522 Harbor Mist Missouri City, Texas 77459 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Whitfield, Gillian Janette, et al Astrum ElementOne Limited Merlin House Langstone Newport NP18 2HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Whitfield, Gillian Janette, et al Astrum ElementOne Limited Tower House Fairfax Street Bristol BS1 3BN / GB | ||
Former [2013/21] | Whitfield, Gillian Janette, et al Astrum ElementOne Limited St Nicholas House 31-34 High Street Bristol BS1 2AW / GB | ||
Former [2009/38] | Whitfield, Gillian Janette Astrum-IP Limited 35 Stow Park Circle Newport South Wales NP20 4HF / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05855559.0 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US47023 | Priority number, date | US20040639040P | 23.12.2004 Original published format: US 639040 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006071849 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827464 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/32, A61K47/44, A61K9/00, A61L15/18, A61L26/00, // A61P17/02 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K33/30 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,US);
A61K9/0017 (EP,US);
A61L15/18 (EP,US);
A61L26/0066 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61L2300/102 (EP,US);
A61L2300/802 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | A61K33/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF ZINKBASIS UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/36] | English: | ZINC-BASED COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2007/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE ZINC ET LEURS METHODES D'UTILISATION | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 11.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 02.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9727837 (DOKMANN SLAVKO [SI]) [X] 1-8,10-16,18-50,52-68,70 * abstract * * claims 1-19 * [I] 9,17,51,69; | [XI]US2004058011 (PETERSSON LENNART G [US]) [X] 1-8,10-16,18-50,52-68,70 * abstract * * claims 1-11 * * page 2, column left, line 1 - line 5 *[I] 9,17,51,69 | International search | [X]US6558710 (GODFREY HELEN REBECCA [US]); | [X]US2004219227 (MODAK SHANTA [US], et al) |