EP1845893 - LOW PROFILE STENT-GRAFT ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited PO Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church, West Indies / BB | [2011/31] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited PO Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERRY, John 130 Bird's Hill Avenue Needham, MA 02492 / US | 02 /
QUIGLEY, Fergus 15 Woodland Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Straße 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Vermeulen, Martijn Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 05855680.4 | 27.12.2005 | [2007/43] | WO2005US47163 | Priority number, date | US20040025826 | 28.12.2004 Original published format: US 25826 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006071906 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845893 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845893 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
A61F2/86 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0076 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STENTPROTHESENBEFESTIGUNG MIT NIEDRIGEM PROFIL | [2007/43] | English: | LOW PROFILE STENT-GRAFT ATTACHMENT | [2007/43] | French: | FIXATION DE GREFFON-ENDOPROTHESE VASCULAIRE PLATE | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HU | 24.08.2011 | IT | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | GB | 27.12.2011 | LU | 27.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
GB | 27.12.2011 | ||
LU | 27.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
GB | 27.12.2011 | ||
LU | 27.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
GB | 27.12.2011 | ||
LU | 27.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
GB | 27.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
GB | 27.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
GB | 27.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5282824 (GIANTURCO CESARE [US]) [A] 1-32* column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 58; figures 1-61 *; | [A]US6152956 (PIERCE GEORGE E [US]) [A] 1-32 * column 1, line 13 - column 8, line 41; figures 1-8 * |