EP1842255 - FUEL CELL POWER PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuvera Fuel Cells, Inc. 129 Concord Road, Building 1 Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'BRIEN, Christopher, J. 17 Ivaloo Street, Apt. 5 Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | 02 /
CROSS III, James, C. 21 Pearl Street Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | 03 /
LESHCHINER, Michael, Yurievich 34 Birch Street Needham, Massachusetts 02494 / US | 04 /
POLEVAYA, Olga 10 Lakin Street Needham, Massachusetts 02494 / US | 05 /
POLLICA, Darryl 179 Trenton Street Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
O'BRIEN, Christopher, J. 17 Ivaloo Street, Apt. 5 Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | ||
02 /
CROSS III, James, C. 21 Pearl Street Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | |||
03 /
LESHCHINER, Michael, Yurievich 390 Normandy Drive Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US | |||
04 /
POLEVAYA, Olga 10 Lakin Street Needham, Massachusetts 02494 / US | |||
05 /
POLLICA, Darryl 179 Trenton Street Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855927.9 | 30.12.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005US47438 | Priority number, date | US20050646701P | 25.01.2005 Original published format: US 646701 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081033 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1842255 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
H01M8/04059 (EP,US);
H01M8/04029 (EP,US);
H01M8/04097 (EP,US);
H01M8/04164 (EP,US);
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
H01M8/0618 (EP,US);
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M2250/402 (EP,US);
H01M2250/407 (EP,US);
H01M8/04268 (EP,US);
Y02B90/10 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENANLAGE | [2007/41] | English: | FUEL CELL POWER PLANTS | [2007/41] | French: | CENTRALES ELECTRIQUES A PILES A COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0267137 (INT FUEL CELLS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,19,20 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 * [Y] 3,21; | [XY]EP0496011 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,19,20 * page 9, line 41 - page 10, line 8; figures 3,9 * [Y] 3,21; | [X]US5482791 (SHINGAI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,19 * column 7, line 1 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1052717 (EQUOS RESEARCH KK [JP]) [Y] 3,21* abstract * |