EP1968811 - INTEGRATED TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH LIMITED HEAT TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/38] | INTEGRATED TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH LIMITED HEAT TRANSFER AND QUICK MOUNT HOUSING | ||
[2012/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place P.O.Box 4015 Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place P.O.Box 4015 Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAKIACHVILI, Bruno 33 Chemin De La Grange F-01360 Beligneux / FR | 02 /
FERREIRA, Joaquim 80 Rue D'elbeuf F-76410 Freneuse / FR | 03 /
SAUDOYEZ, Claude 17 Rue Des Houlettes F-76750 Vieux Manoir / FR | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05856097.0 | 20.12.2005 | [2008/38] | WO2005US47632 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007073391 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1968811 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1968811 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, F25D19/02, B60H1/32 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
F25D19/02 (EP,US);
B60H1/00014 (EP,US);
B60H1/3229 (EP,US);
B60H1/3232 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00235 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53113 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | B60H1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE TRANSPORTKÜHLEINHEIT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNG | [2012/50] | English: | INTEGRATED TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH LIMITED HEAT TRANSFER | [2012/50] | French: | UNITE DE REFRIGERATION DE TRANSPORT INTEGREE AVEC TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR LIMITE | [2012/50] |
Former [2008/38] | INTEGRIERTE TRANSPORTKÜHLEINHEIT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNG UND SCHNELLBEFESTIGUNGSGEHÄUSE | ||
Former [2008/38] | INTEGRATED TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH LIMITED HEAT TRANSFER AND QUICK MOUNT HOUSING | ||
Former [2008/38] | UNITE DE REFRIGERATION DE TRANSPORT INTEGREE AVEC TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR LIMITE ET CARROSSERIE A MONTAGE RAPIDE | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2005 | AT | 01.05.2013 | BE | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | IE | 20.12.2013 | LU | 20.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
PT | 02.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6536222 (AHN YOUNG-KILL [KR], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 * [I] 2-3,7-15; | [Y]US4043143 (FLUDER CHESTER HENRY, et al) [Y] 1-3,7-15 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 5; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]EP0070636 (MASSEY FERGUSON SERVICES NV [NL]) [Y] 1-3,7-15 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure 9 * | International search | [Y]US4622831 (GRUPA JOHANN [DE]); | [Y]US3680468 (SCHUELER CARL A); | [YE]US6983619 (HILLE ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [Y]US4641502 (ALDRICH ROGER L [US], et al); | [A]US4048911 (PETERSEN ROSS K); | [A]US4196657 (CRONGEYER JERRY P [US], et al); | [A]US4690040 (BARNETT TIMOTHY J [US]); | [A]US6282912 (MANNERHEIM GUNNAR [CA]); | [A]US5184474 (FERDOWS HOUSHANG [US]); | [A]US6339934 (YOON KYUNG-HWAN [KR], et al); | [Y]US5791156 (STRAUTMAN THOMAS J [US], et al) | by applicant | US6536222 |