EP1797234 - OUTER ROTOR TYPE MOTOR AND DRUM TYPE WASHING MACHINE INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-010 / KR | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Man Seung Legal Team of Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
HAN, Man Seung, Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-dong, Mapo-gu Seoul 121-010 / KR | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05856437.8 | 05.10.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005KR03282 | Priority number, date | KR20040080256 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040080256 | KR20040080258 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040080258 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080686 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797234 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/30 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
H02K1/30 (EP,US);
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
H02K1/32 (EP,US);
H02K7/003 (EP,US);
H02K9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSENLÄUFERMOTOR UND TROMMELWASCHMASCHINE DAMIT | [2007/25] | English: | OUTER ROTOR TYPE MOTOR AND DRUM TYPE WASHING MACHINE INCLUDING SAME | [2007/25] | French: | MOTEUR DU TYPE A ROTOR EXTERIEUR ET MACHINE A LAVER DE TYPE A TAMBOUR COMPORTANT UN TEL MOTEUR | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 16.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5778703 (IMAI MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]EP1094145 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |