EP1839065 - APPARATUS FOR COOLING AN RF COIL ON A MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M2M Imaging Corp. 105 Lock Street, Suite 311 Newark, NJ 07103 / US | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVRIES, Jon T. 225 St. Pauls Ave.,Apt. 14D Jersey City, NJ 07306 / US | 02 /
GAO, Erzhen 936 Ridgewood Rd. Millburn, NJ 07041 / US | 03 /
KUNIMOTO, Wallace P.O. Box 822 Goleta, CA 93116 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 Brussels Airport Business Park 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 05857012.8 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/40] | WO2005US42526 | Priority number, date | US20040630457P | 23.11.2004 Original published format: US 630457 P | US20040630223P | 23.11.2004 Original published format: US 630223 P | US20040630220P | 23.11.2004 Original published format: US 630220 P | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006083364 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1839065 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/34 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G01R33/34053 (EP,US);
G01R33/3403 (EP,US);
G01R33/34061 (EP,US);
G01R33/34076 (EP,US);
G01R33/3415 (EP,US);
G01R33/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KÜHLUNG EINER RF-SPULE AUF EINEM SYSTEM ZUR ABBILDUNG MAGNETISCHER RESONANZEN | [2007/40] | English: | APPARATUS FOR COOLING AN RF COIL ON A MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM | [2007/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT CRYOGENE D'UNE BOBINE SUR UN SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE A RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 17.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH01262852 ; | [A]JPH07163543 ; | [A]GB2056086 (EMI LTD) [A] 1-5,14-19,36,37,41 * page 3, line 67 - line 88 *; | [A]US6100693 (EBERLER LUDWIG [DE], et al) [A] 1-41 * column 4, line 55 - line 65; claim 1 *; | [X]US6812705 (SELLERS MICHAEL BEN [US]) [X] 1-9,14-28,34-37,41 * column 4, line 9 - line 17 * * column 4, line 53 - line 56 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 22 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900117), vol. 014, no. 020, Database accession no. (C - 676), & JP01262852 A 19891019 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,5,6,14,17-19,36 * abstract * | [A] - WRIGHT A C ET AL, "IN VIVO MR MICRO IMAGING WITH CONVENTIONAL RADIOFREQUENCY COILS COOLED TO 77oK", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (200002), vol. 43, no. 2, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 163 - 169, XP000890752 [A] 1,14,36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2594(200002)43:2<163::AID-MRM1>3.0.CO;2-K | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07163543 A 19950627 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [A] 1,5,6,14,20,21,36 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH01262852 | US6812705 | - WRIGHT ET AL., "In Vivo MR Micro Imaging with Conventional Radio&equency Coils Cooled to 77K", MRM, (2000), vol. 43, pages 163 - 169 | US20040630547 | US20040630223 | US20040630220 |