EP1835898 - METHODS FOR MODULATING TUMOR GROWTH AND METASTASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXIGENE, INC. 230 Third Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPLIN, David J. 14 Plowden Park, Aston Rowant Watlington, Oxforshore OX9 5SX / GB | 02 /
EDVARDSEN, Klaus Genmab, Toldbodgade 55B 1253 Copenhagen K / DK | 03 /
YOUNG, Scott 105 Old Bolton Road Stowe, Massachusetts 01775 / US | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
CHAPLIN, David J. 14 Plowden Park, Aston Rowant Watlington, Oxforshore OX9 5SX / GB | ||
02 /
EDVARDSEN, Klaus Klampenborgvei 16 DK - 2930 Klampenborg / DK | |||
03 /
YOUNG, Scott 105 Old Bolton Road Stowe, Massachusetts 01775 / US | |||
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
CHAPLIN, David J. 14 Plowden Park, Aston Rowant Watlington, Oxforshore OX9 5SX / GB | ||
02 /
EDVARDSEN, Klaus Stora Grabrodersgatan 13 S-222 22 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
YOUNG, Scott 105 Old Bolton Road Stowe, Massachusetts 01775 / US | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05857206.6 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005US46960 | Priority number, date | US20040020463 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 20463 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006078422 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835898 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/09, A61P35/00, A61K31/337, A61K31/555, G01N33/50 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/09 (EP,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DES TUMORWACHSTUMS UND VON METASTASEN | [2007/39] | English: | METHODS FOR MODULATING TUMOR GROWTH AND METASTASIS | [2007/39] | French: | METHODE DE MODULATION DE LA CROISSANCE TUMORALE ET DES METASTASES | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/25] | 16.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.07.2012 | 18.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1068870 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [X] 15,16,20-22,25,27,32 * claims 3,4 *; | [X]WO02056692 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [X] 15-22,25-27,32 * claims 1,4 *; | [X]WO02074229 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR]) [X] 15-17,20,25,27,32 * claims 2-8,17 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, INTERNET ARTICLE, URL: http://www.corporate-ir.net/ireye/ir_site.zhtml?ticker=OXGN&script=416&layout=0&item_id=655483, (20041216), XP002386512 [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11,13,15-18,20,21,23-25,27,33-37,39-41,44-48,51 * the whole document * | [X] - "745 poster Tumour antivascular effects of combretastatin a-4 phosphate (CA4P) in combination with radiotherapy measured using dynamic contrast enhanced computed tomography (DCE-CT)", RADIOTHERAPY AND ONCOLOGY, ELSEVIER, (200410), vol. 73, ISSN 0167-8140, page S322, XP005069193 [X] 15,16,25-27,32 * abstract * | [X] - NELKIN B D ET AL, "COMBRETASTATIN A-4 AND DOXORUBICIN COMBINATION TREATMENT IF EFFECTIVE IN A PRECLINICAL MODEL OF HUMAN MEDULLARY THYROID CARCINOMA", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, NATIONAL HELLENIC RESEARCH FOUNDATION, ATHENS, GR, (200101), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 157 - 160, XP008013083 [X] 15,16,25-27 * the whole document * | [X] - GROSIOS K ET AL, "COMBINATION CHEMOTHERAPY WITH COMBRETASTATIN A-4 PHOSPHATE AND 5-FLUOROURACIL IN AN EXPERIMENTAL MURINE COLON ADENOCARCINOMA", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, HELENIC ANTICANCER INSTITUTE, ATHENS,, GR, (200001), vol. 20, no. 1A, ISSN 0250-7005, pages 229 - 233, XP008012523 [X] 15,16,25,27 * the whole document * | [A] - YOUNG SCOTT L; CHAPLIN DAVID J, "Combretastatin A4 phosphate: background and current clinical status", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (200409), vol. 13, no. 9, pages 1171 - 1182, XP002386513 [A] * page 1175; table 1 * | [A] - SIEMANN DIETMAR W; CHAPLIN DAVID J; HORSMAN MICHAEL R, "Vascular-targeting therapies for treatment of malignant disease", CANCER, (20040612), vol. 100, no. 12, pages 2491 - 2499, XP002386514 [A] * page 2496; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.20299 | Examination | - YAMAMOTO KENJI ET AL, "Modulation of cisplatin sensitivity by taxol in cisplatin-sensitive and -resistant human ovarian carcinoma cell lines", JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (200003), vol. 126, no. 3, ISSN 0171-5216, pages 168 - 172 | - KOMURO YUUKI ET AL, "Paclitaxel and SN-38 overcome cisplatin resistance of ovarian cancer cell lines by down-regulating the influx and efflux system of cisplatin", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH, (200111), vol. 92, no. 11, ISSN 0910-5050, pages 1242 - 1250 |