EP1812346 - ZEOLITE COMPOSITIONS AND PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING Tour Total 24 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2010/47] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Total France Tour Total, 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMEIREN, Walter Winningstraat 4 B-3530 Houthalen / BE | 02 /
DATH, Jean-Pierre Rue d'Ath 53 B-7970 Beloeil / BE | 03 /
BUONO, Valérie Rue des Futaies, 9 B-7020 Nimy / BE | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Largeau, Béatrice, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Largeau, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05857343.7 | 25.11.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005IB03553 | Priority number, date | EP20040292793 | 26.11.2004 Original published format: EP 04292793 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092657 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812346 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1812346 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C01B37/00, C01B39/08 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C01B37/005 (EP,US);
C01B37/007 (EP,US);
C01B39/08 (EP,US);
C01B39/082 (EP,US);
C01B39/085 (EP,US);
C01B39/087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEOLITENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2007/31] | English: | ZEOLITE COMPOSITIONS AND PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | [2007/31] | French: | COMPOSITION ZEOLITIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION DE LADITE COMPOSITION | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 22.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | IE | 25.11.2010 | LU | 25.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GB | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.11.2010 | ||
LU | 25.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GB | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GB | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GB | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4088605 (ROLLMANN LOUIS D) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US4203869 (ROLLMANN LOUIS D [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0113473 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-26,1,29,24 * the whole document * * claims 1-3 * * claims 5,6 * * page 4, lines 3-16 *; | [X]US4503164 (SATO HARUHITO [JP]) [X] 1-29 * column 2, lines 42-58 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US4533533 (DEWING JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [A]EP0174780 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-29,1,12,13 * claims 1-3 * * abstract * * claim 4 *; | [A]US4654316 (BARRI SAMI A I [GB], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4788374 (CHU POCHEN [US], et al) [X] 24-29,12-16 * abstract * * column 2, lines 45-54 * * column 5, lines 5-20 * [A] 1; | [A]US6114551 (LEVIN DORON [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 3, lines 19-39 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A] - WU PENG ET AL, "A Novel Titanosilicate with MWW Structure. I. Hydrothermal Synthesis, Elimination of Extraframework Titanium, and Characterizations", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY. B, MATERIALS, SURFACES, INTERFACES AND BIOPHYSICAL, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010415), vol. 105, no. 15, ISSN 1089-5647, pages 2897 - 2905, XP002204295 [A] 16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp002816s | [A] - WU PENG ET AL, "Hydrothermal synthesis of a novel titanosilicate with MWW topology", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO, JP, (20000705), no. 7, ISSN 0366-7022, pages 774 - 775, XP002204294 [A] 16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.2000.774 |