EP1793812 - ANTIBIOTIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETT, John, F. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
HERATH, Kithsiri, B. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
JAYASURIYA, Hiranthi 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
MASUREKAR, Prakash, S. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
ONDEYKA, John, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
SINGH, Sheo, Bux 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Chaowei 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05857569.7 | 16.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005US33326 | Priority number, date | US20040611951P | 22.09.2004 Original published format: US 611951 P | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006086012 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793812 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K38/12, A61K38/14, C12P21/02, C12P21/04, C07K9/00, C07K7/50, C07K7/54, C07K7/58 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
C07K9/008 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIBIOTISCHE VERBINDUNG | [2007/24] | English: | ANTIBIOTIC COMPOUND | [2007/24] | French: | COMPOSE ANTIBIOTIQUE | [2007/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LI W ET AL, "NOCATHIACINS NEW THIAZOLYL PEPTIDE ANTIBIOTICS FROM NOCARDIA SP. I. TAXONOMY FERMENTATION AND BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (20030301), vol. 56, no. 3, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 226 - 231, XP009066037 [X] 1,3-8 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6218398 (LEET JOHN E [US], et al); | [A] - REN ET AL., "Mild Method for Cleavage of Dehydroalanine Units: Highly Efficient Conversion of Nocathiacin I to Nocathiacin IV", J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, no. 24, pages 8699 - 8702, XP003005149 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo0261698 |