EP1799883 - COATED SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/26] | COATED SUBSTRATES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | ||
[2012/44] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland MI 48686-0994 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOBODA, Mark 4729 Morningside Drive Bay City, MI 48706 / US | 02 /
SNOW, Steven 42 Beech Street Sanford, MI 48657 / US | 03 /
WEIDNER, William 1516 6th Street Bay City, MI 48708 / US | 04 /
ZAMBOV, Ludmil 6020 Jefferson Avenue,Apartment 03 Midland, MI 48640 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05858066.3 | 12.08.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US28956 | Priority number, date | US20040602394P | 18.08.2004 Original published format: US 602394 P | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007001337 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1799883 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
C23C28/322 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02126 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/341 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
C23C28/42 (EP,US);
C23C28/44 (EP,US);
H01L21/022 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02211 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3145 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE SUBSTRATE | [2012/44] | English: | COATED SUBSTRATES | [2012/44] | French: | SUBSTRATS REVETUS | [2012/44] |
Former [2007/26] | BESCHICHTETE SUBSTRATE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2007/26] | COATED SUBSTRATES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | ||
Former [2007/26] | SUBSTRATS REVETUS, PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP12187679.1 / EP2546388 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2006023437 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * figures 3,6; examples 1-5; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP1428906 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-10 * example 22; claims 1-5; table 7 *; | [A]US2002173172 (LOBODA MARK JON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 22; example 1; table 2 *; | [A] - HEAN JU LEE ET AL, "The mechanical properties of the SiOC(-H) composite thin films with a low dielectric constant", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020701), vol. 171, no. 1-3, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 296 - 301, XP002327886 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(03)00289-5 | by applicant | US6593655 | US6667553 |