EP1814713 - THE FABRICATION AND APPLICATION OF NANOFIBER RIBBONS AND SHEETS AND TWISTED AND NON-TWISTED NANOFIBER YARNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th St. Austin TX 78701 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th St. Austin TX 78701 / US | ||
For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2602 / AU | |||
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states The Board of Regents the University of Texas 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | ||
For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2602 / AU | |||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states The Board of Regents the University of Texas 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Mei 5824 Colby Drive Plano, TX 75094 / US | 02 /
FANG, Shaoli 430 Buckingham Rd. No. 1633 Richardson, TX 75081 / US | 03 /
BAUGHMAN, Ray, H. 5428 Willow Wood Lane Dallas, TX 75252 / US | 04 /
ZAKHIDOV, Anvar, A. 1500 Berwick Dr. McKinney, TX 75070 / US | 05 /
ATKINSON, Kenneth, Ross 14 Montpellier Drive Highton, VIC 3216 / AU | 06 /
ALIEV, Ali, E. 7825 McCallum Blvd. No. 1506 Dallas, TX 75252 / US | 07 /
LI, Sergey 7815 McCallum Blvd. No. 13203 Dallas, TX 75252 / US | 08 /
WILLIAMS, Chris 17878 Preston Road No. 316 Dallas, TX 75252 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Wells, Andrew, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05858487.1 | 09.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005US41031 | Priority number, date | US20040626314P | 09.11.2004 Original published format: US 626314 P | US20050666351P | 30.03.2005 Original published format: US 666351 P | US20050702444P | 26.07.2005 Original published format: US 702444 P | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007015710 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814713 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D01F9/12 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/16 (KR);
D02G3/16 (EP,CN,US);
C01B32/158 (US);
B29C48/0019 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B5/02 (US);
B32B5/12 (US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,CN,US);
C01B32/15 (US);
C01B32/154 (US);
C01B32/16 (EP,US);
C01B32/164 (EP,US);
C01B32/168 (EP,US);
C01B32/17 (US);
C01B32/18 (EP,US);
C01B32/36 (US);
C04B35/62231 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62272 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62281 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62855 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62892 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62897 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/80 (US);
C23C16/44 (US);
C23C16/50 (US);
D01F9/08 (US);
D01F9/12 (US);
D01F9/127 (US);
D01F9/1273 (US);
D01F9/1275 (EP,CN,US);
D02G3/28 (CN,US);
D02G3/44 (US);
D04H3/002 (US);
D06B15/00 (US);
D06M15/256 (US);
D06M15/333 (US);
G01L1/2287 (US);
G02F1/133308 (US);
H01B1/24 (EP,US);
H01B5/08 (US);
H01G11/36 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0565 (US);
H01M4/926 (US);
H05K9/0081 (US);
H10K30/821 (EP,US);
H10K50/81 (US);
H10K59/8051 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K85/221 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/106 (US);
B32B2307/202 (US);
B32B2310/00 (US);
B32B2313/04 (US);
B82Y30/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
C01B2202/06 (US);
C01B2202/08 (US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/5248 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/526 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/5264 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/616 (US);
D10B2101/122 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133334 (US);
G02F1/15165 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/8605 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/30 (US);
H10K50/828 (US);
H10K59/80524 (EP,CN,KR);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/13 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P20/133 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10S977/742 (EP,US);
Y10S977/745 (EP,US);
Y10S977/746 (EP,US);
Y10S977/752 (EP,US);
Y10S977/843 (EP,US);
Y10S977/844 (EP,US);
Y10S977/847 (EP,US);
Y10S977/848 (EP,US);
Y10S977/932 (EP,US);
Y10S977/948 (EP,US);
Y10S977/961 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | B29C47/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG VON NANOFASERBÄNDERN UND FOLIEN SOWIE GEDREHTEN UND NICHTGEDREHTEN NANOFASERGARNEN | [2007/32] | English: | THE FABRICATION AND APPLICATION OF NANOFIBER RIBBONS AND SHEETS AND TWISTED AND NON-TWISTED NANOFIBER YARNS | [2007/32] | French: | FABRICATION ET APPLICATIONS DE RUBANS, FEUILLES ET FILS RETORS OU NON DE NANOFIBRES | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 24.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US2004053780 (JIANG KAILI [CN], et al); | International search | [A]US6106913 (SCARDINO FRANK L [US], et al); | [X]US7045108 (JIANG KAILI [CN], et al); | [XE]US2007116631 (LI QINGWEN [US], et al); |