EP1831032 - ARTICLE FOR HOLDING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dubois Limited Amaray House, Arkwright Road Corby Northants NN17 5AE / GB | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIN, John Glenelg Low Barn, Burley Lane, Menston Leeds LS29 6EX / GB | 02 /
FARRAR, Peter, Antony Glenelg, Low Barn, Burley Lane, Menston Leeds LS29 6EX / GB | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby CV21 2LQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/37] | Unwin, Stephen Geoffrey, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05858502.7 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005GB02111 | Priority number, date | GB20040012116 | 29.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0412116 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007071887 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831032 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831032 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B42F9/00, G11B33/04 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B42F9/00 (EP,GB,US);
F16B2/22 (GB);
Y10T24/206 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44769 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | ARTIKEL ZUM HALTEN EINES OBJEKTS | [2007/37] | English: | ARTICLE FOR HOLDING AN OBJECT | [2007/37] | French: | ARTICLE POUR TENIR UN OBJET | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2005 | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | IE | 27.05.2012 | LU | 27.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 27.05.2012 | ||
LU | 27.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 27.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 27.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 27.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 27.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4036882 ; | [A]EP0575026 (HUNKE & JOCHHEIM [DE]); | [AD]WO03051747 (NEXPAK CORP [US]) | by applicant | WO03051747 |