EP1657633 - Routing and forwarding table management for network processor architectures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RadiSys Corporation 5445 N.E. Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro OR 97124 / US | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Radisys Microware Communications Software Division, Inc. 1500 NW 118th Street Des Moines, IA 50325 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwaderer, Curt 4738 92nd Court Urvindale Iowa 50322 / US | 02 /
Lyons, David 1240 Office Plaza Drive West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | 03 /
Stoen, Rick 1240 Office Plaza Drive West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | [2008/09] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Schwaderer, Curt 4738 92nd Court Urvindale Iowa 50266 / US | ||
02 /
Lyons, David 1240 Office Plaza Drive West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | |||
03 /
Stoen, Rick 1240 Office Plaza Drive West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | |||
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
Schwaderer, Curt 1500 NW 118th Street Des Moines IA 50325 / US | ||
02 /
Lyons, David 1550 NW 118th Street Des Moines IA 50325 / US | |||
03 /
Stoen, Rick 1550 NW 118th Street Des Moines IA 50325 / US | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Patentanwälte Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000066.8 | 09.11.2002 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | US20010045681 | 09.11.2001 Original published format: US 45681 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657633 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657633 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, H04L12/56 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
H04L45/48 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/54 (EP,US);
H04L49/309 (EP,US);
H04L45/76 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/20] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2007/04] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwaltung von Routing- und Weiterleitungstabellen für Netzwerkprozessorarchitekturen | [2006/20] | English: | Routing and forwarding table management for network processor architectures | [2006/20] | French: | Gestion d'une table d'acheminement et de réacheminement pour des architectures de processeur de réseau | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02782277.4 / EP1454243 | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.07.2008 | CZ | 02.07.2008 | EE | 02.07.2008 | SK | 02.07.2008 | TR | 02.07.2008 | BG | 02.10.2008 | GR | 03.10.2008 | LU | 09.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | PT | 02.12.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
TR | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 02.07.2008 | |
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | BG | 02.10.2008 | |
PT | 02.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5815501 (GADDIS MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * column 5, line 11 - line 29; figure 3 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 17 * * column 9, line 9 - line 18; figure 8 * * column 10, line 1 - line 37; figure 9 * * column 13, line 1 - line 4 *; | [XA] - INTEL, "INTEL IXP1200 NETWORK Processor Family Hardware Reference Manual", (20010810), pages 1 - 272, URL: http://www.ixpintel.nntu.nnov.ru/dokym_rykov/proc_ixp1200/pdf/IXP1200%20HW%20Ref%20Manual.pdf, (20060307), XP002370938 [X] 1,3-9,12 * page 18, line 1, paragraph 2.2 - page 19, line 11; figure 2.1 * * page 19, line 1, paragraph 2.3 - page 20, line 5 * * page 27, line 1 - line 5; figure 2.6 * * page 36, line 15 - line 16; table 2.2 * * page 101, line 1, paragraph 4.11 - line 10 * * page 134, line 14, paragraph 5.2.3.2 - line 18 * * page 260, paragraph 8.8.1 - page 262, paragraph 8.8.1; figures 8.9-8.12 * * page 262, line 1 - line 2 * [A] 10,11 | [XA] - INTEL, "Intel WAN/LAN Access Switch Example Design for the Intel IXP1200 Network Processor", (200105), pages 1 - 20, URL: ftp://download.intel.com/design/network/applnots/27352801.pdf, (20060303), XP007900110 [X] 1,3,8,9,12 * page 6, paragraph 2.0 * * page 10; table 1 * * page 11, paragraph 2.2.1.5 - paragraph 2.2.1.6 * * page 11, line 12, paragraph 2.2.2.1 - line 15, paragraph 2.2.2.1 * * page 15; figure 4 * [A] 4 |