EP1780595 - Height-adjustable work and projection board and height-adjustable projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promethean GmbH Thea-Leymann-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hövel, Michael Niemark 20 48708 Stadtlohn / DE | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Habbel, Hans-Georg Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000242.5 | 07.01.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | DE20052016926U | 28.10.2005 Original published format: DE 202005016926 U | [2007/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1780595 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/56, G03B21/14, H04N5/64, F16M11/18 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G03B21/562 (EP);
F16M11/18 (EP);
F16M11/24 (EP);
G03B21/10 (EP);
G03B21/145 (EP);
H04N9/3141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/02] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Höhenverstellbare Arbeits- und Projektionstafel und höhenverstellbarer Projektor | [2007/18] | English: | Height-adjustable work and projection board and height-adjustable projector | [2007/18] | French: | Tableau de projection et de travail réglable en hauteur et projecteur réglable en hauteur | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH632399 (WEIDMANN S HEINRICH ERBEN [CH]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0284864 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-5* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6520646 (RODRIGUEZ JR ERNESTO M [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 17 - column 8, line 16; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2005117129 (ISHINO HIROHISA [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] - [0030]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005162409 (HENDRIKS FERDINAND [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] - [0009] - [0043] - [0046]; figures 1,2,4 * |