EP1808547 - System comprising a plurality of panels for forming an assembled surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERRY FINANCE NV Ingelmunstersteenweg 162 8780 Oostrozebeke / BE | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boucké, Eddy Hyacintenstraat 14 8930 Menen / BE | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000752.3 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808547 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/04 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B44C5/04 (EP);
A47G27/0293 (EP);
B44C1/28 (EP);
E04F15/041 (EP);
E04F15/06 (EP);
E04F15/082 (EP);
E04F15/105 (EP);
E04F15/107 (EP);
E04F2201/0138 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Title | German: | System mit einer Mehrzahl von Paneelen zum Herstellen eines Flächenverbunds | [2007/29] | English: | System comprising a plurality of panels for forming an assembled surface | [2007/29] | French: | Système avec une pluralité de panneaux pour obtenir une surface assemblée | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003101674 (PERVAN DARKO [SE], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 9a-9e *; | [X]DE20013138U (HUANG CHIN CHIH [TW]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * figures 1,3,5 *; | [X]EP1584484 (POLYGO [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2003145549 (PALSSON JORGEN [SE], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 20b *; | [X]EP0985550 (FARGEOT XAVIER [FR]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1-7 * |