EP1684532 - System for re-establishment of a packet data call [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Alcatel 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibson Ang, Soon Teck 2 Silver Drive Apt. 10 NH 03060 NASHUA / US | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Wörz, Volker Alfred Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001066.7 | 19.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | US20050644973P | 19.01.2005 Original published format: US 644973 P | US20060001263 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: US 1263 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684532 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04W76/38 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | System für die Wiederherstellung einer Paketdatenverbindung | [2006/30] | English: | System for re-establishment of a packet data call | [2006/30] | French: | Système pour rétablissement d'une communication de données par paquets | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 26.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0872982 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 44 - line 46 * * page 4, line 55 - line 57 * * page 5, line 25 - line 30 * * page 7, line 14 - line 16 * * page 7, line 45 - line 52 * * page 8, line 5 - line 6 * * page 8, line 13 - line 20 * * figure 4 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2002006114 (BJELLAND FRODE [NO], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US6628954 (MCGOWAN ROSEMARY [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 6, line 22 - line 58 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 3 * * figure 4 *; | [A]WO0001173 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-5,7-10 * abstract * * page 6, line 3 - line 20 * * page 8, line 6 - line 21 * * page 12, line 24 - line 32 * * figure 4 * * figure 9 * |