EP1683472 - Variable direction of view instrument with distal image sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz Imaging, Inc. 1 S. Los Carneros Road Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Karl Storz Imaging Inc. 175B Cremona Drive Goleta, CA 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoeg, Hans David 19 La Porte Street Suite Apt. 102 91006-2672 Arcadia / US | 02 /
Tesar, John Clement 3630 East Marshall Gulch Place 85718-2337 Tucson / US | 03 /
Schara, Nathan Jon 33 South Craig Apt.3 91107-4068 Pasadena / US | 04 /
Hale, Eric L. 257 East Calaveras Street 91001 Altadena / US | [2019/39] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
Hoeg, Hans David 19 La Porte Street Suite Apt. 102 91006-2672 Arcadia / US | ||
02 /
Tesar, John Clement 3630 East Marshall Gulch Place 85718-2337 Tucson / US | |||
03 /
Schara, Nathan Jon 33 South Craig Apt.3 91107-4068 Pasadena / US | |||
04 /
Hale, Eric L. 257 East Calaveras Street 91001 Altadena / US | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2006/30] | Heuckeroth, Volker, et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001311.7 | 23.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | US20050646203P | 21.01.2005 Original published format: US 646203 P | US20060336212 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 336212 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683472 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683472 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1683472 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/05, A61B1/005, G02B23/24 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G02B13/22 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,US);
A61B1/00183 (EP,US);
A61B1/05 (EP,US);
A61B1/051 (EP,US);
G02B23/2423 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2019/39] |
Former [2007/15] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Instrument mit variabler Blickrichtung und distalem Bildsensor | [2006/30] | English: | Variable direction of view instrument with distal image sensor | [2006/30] | French: | Instrument a direction de visée variable et capteur d'image distale | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 27.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2012
25.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE OLYMPUS WINTER & IBE GMBH Kuehnstrasse 61 22045 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2016/42] |
Former [2012/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2012
OLYMPUS WINTER & IBE GMBH Kuehnstrasse 61 22045 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Seemann, Ralph Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 D-20095 Hamburg / DE | 29.06.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.11.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.11.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.02.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.08.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 19.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0434/14 | 23.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.01.2019 | [2020/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6371909 (HOEG HANS D [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US2003092966 (SCHARA NATHAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 46; figures 1-15 * * column 3, line 32 - column 10, line 36 *; | [A]DE4241938 (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13,20-28 * column 1, line 7 - column 9, line 16; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2004112594 (WIMMER VIKTOR JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-13,20-28 * page 1, line 6 - page 6, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]US4720178 (NISHIOKA KIMIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13,20-28 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 14; figures 1-19 * * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A]US4598980 (DOI YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13,20-28 * column 1, line 11 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4685451 (ANDO KUNIO [JP]) [A] 1-13,20-28 * column 1, line 16 - column 5, line 48; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US2764149 | US4074306 | US4253447 | US4697577 | US6371909 | US6500115 | US6560013 | US5762603 | Opposition | US4573450 | DE3529026 | US2003092966 | US6371909 | DE3426429 |