EP1810934 - Partitioned package structure for separately containing liquid material and solid material and allowing the liquid material and solid material to be conveniently mixed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yung Shin Pharm. Ind. Co. Ltd. No. 1191, Sec.1 Jhongshan Rd. Dajia Township Taichung County 437 / TW | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Fang-Yu No. 1191, Sec.1, Jhongshan Road Dajia Township Taichung County 437 / TW | 02 /
Liang, Kuo-Tung No. 27, Gong 9th Road Dajia Township Taichung County / TW | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Pillep, Bernhard Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Pillep, Bernhard Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001339.8 | 23.01.2006 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810934 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1810934 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
B65D81/3294 (EP);
B65D25/08 (EP);
B65D2577/2066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2008/14] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verpackung zum getrennten Aufbewahren von einer Flüssigkeit und einem festen Material, die das Vermengen der Flüssigkeit mit dem festen Material ermöglicht. | [2007/30] | English: | Partitioned package structure for separately containing liquid material and solid material and allowing the liquid material and solid material to be conveniently mixed | [2007/30] | French: | Emballage à partitions pour contenir séparément un matériau liquide et un matériau solide et permettre le mélange du matériau liquide et du matériau solide. | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE29913844U (KLOCKE VERPACKUNGS SERVICE [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]FR1398922 (M. CHARLES FRANCOIS EMILE MAUPAS) [Y] 3 * page 2, column 2, lines 30-38; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5893452 (DE NERVO STANISLAS [FR]) [Y] 4,5 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3717512 (IVERS LEE AG [CH]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2002012273 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002012273 A 20020115 (ISHII SANGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2002012273 |