EP1650548 - Surface plasmon sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naya, Masayuki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 798 Miyanodai, Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001541.9 | 29.04.1997 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | JP19960109398 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: JP 10939896 | JP19960119892 | 15.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11989296 | JP19960141698 | 04.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14169896 | JP19960233864 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23386496 | JP19960233868 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23386896 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1650548 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1650548 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/55 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/553 (EP,US);
G01N21/211 (EP,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N27/44721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2010/30] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Oberflächenplasmonensensor | [2006/17] | English: | Surface plasmon sensor | [2006/17] | French: | Capteur de plasmons de surface | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 19.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97107066.9 / EP0805347 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970107066) is 15.07.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5485277 (FOSTER MARK W [US]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 61 - line 63 * * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - line 27 *; | [X]WO9204617 (FISONS PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * page 4, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 *; | [X] - YEATMAN E M, "Resolution and sensitivity in surface plasmon microscopy and sensing", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19960101), vol. 11, no. 6-7, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 635 - 649, XP002372994 [X] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0956-5663(96)83298-2 |