EP1653456 - Recording medium with copy protection information formed in intermittent or alternate wobbled pits and apparatus and methods for forming, recording, and reproducing the recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suh, Sang Woon 110-709, Hyundai Apt. 1346, Seocho 2-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-861 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin Yong 109-602, Seonkyung Apt. Yatap-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam, Kyunggi-do 463-928 / KR | [2012/15] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
Suh, Sang Woon 110-709, Hyundai Apt., 1346, Seocho 2-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-861 / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Jin Yong 109-602, Seonkyung Apt., Yatap-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam, Kyunggi-do 463-928 / KR | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/18] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001616.9 | 20.01.2004 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | KR20030004487 | 23.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003004487 | KR20030005211 | 27.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003005211 | KR20030016139 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003016139 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1653456 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1653456 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1653456 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B20/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
G11B19/122 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00115 (EP,US);
G11B20/00268 (EP,US);
G11B20/00304 (EP,US);
G11B20/00492 (EP,US);
G11B20/00601 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/1426 (EP,US);
G11B27/19 (EP,US);
G11B27/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/0053 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/24082 (EP,US);
G11B2020/122 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1238 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1239 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1279 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium mit Kopierschutzinformation in intermittierenden oder abwechselnd gewobbelten Pits sowie Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung, Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe des Aufzeichnungsmediums | [2011/44] | English: | Recording medium with copy protection information formed in intermittent or alternate wobbled pits and apparatus and methods for forming, recording, and reproducing the recording medium | [2006/18] | French: | Support d'enregistrement doté d'informations de protection de copie formées dans des creux oscillés intermittents ou alternés et appareil et procédés pour former, enregistrer et reproduire le support d'enregistrement | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/18] | Aufzeichnungsmedium mit Kopierschutzformation in intermittierenden oder abwechselnd gewobbelten Pits sowie Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung, Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe des Aufzeichnungsmediums | Examination procedure | 26.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2011 | 15.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04703541.5 / EP1586090 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040703541) is 24.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2004 | AT | 11.04.2012 | BE | 11.04.2012 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | DK | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | IT | 11.04.2012 | NL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 11.04.2012 | |
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
SE | 11.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0545472 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 3,8-10,15,16 * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 18 * * claim 3 *; | [XY]EP0723216 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,11,12,14,17-19 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,8-10,13,15,16; | [Y]US5809006 (DAVIS HEDLEY C [US], et al) [Y] 4,13 * abstract ** column 10, line 13 - line 30 * | by applicant | US5809006 |