EP1813450 - Vehicle with tilting suspension system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fondazione Torino Wireless Galleria San Federico, 54 10129 Torino / IT | For all designated states POLITECNICO DI TORINO Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 24 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Fondazione Torino Wireless Galleria San Federico 54 10129 Torino / IT | ||
For all designated states POLITECNICO DI TORINO Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 24 10129 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Fondazione Torino Wireless Galleria San Federico 54 10129 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonoli, Andrea Via IV Novembere 9 Avigliana (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Festini, Andrea Via Col di Lana 14 Collegno (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Cavalli, Fabio Via Pavia 25 Alessandria / IT | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Mola, Edoardo Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Mola, Edoardo Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2007/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001707.6 | 27.01.2006 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813450 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813450 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60G21/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
B60G21/007 (EP,US);
B60G17/015 (EP,US);
B60G2204/421 (EP,US);
B60G2300/45 (EP,US);
B62K5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Seitlich neigbares Fahrzeug | [2007/31] | English: | Vehicle with tilting suspension system | [2007/31] | French: | Véhicule comprenant un système de suspension permettant l'inclinaison du véhicule | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2010 | BE | 07.04.2010 | CZ | 07.04.2010 | DK | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | HU | 07.04.2010 | IT | 07.04.2010 | LT | 07.04.2010 | LV | 07.04.2010 | NL | 07.04.2010 | PL | 07.04.2010 | RO | 07.04.2010 | SE | 07.04.2010 | SI | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | TR | 07.04.2010 | CY | 12.05.2010 | BG | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | ES | 18.07.2010 | IS | 07.08.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
TR | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | SI | 07.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2745757 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [Y]US5765846 (BRAUN DIETER [DE]); | [X]WO2005002957 (FRIEND INTERNAT AS [NO], et al); | [XAY]FR2872772 (MOULENE SARL [FR]) |