EP1689127 - Method and apparatus for operation of a terminal based on relative grant of a non-serving base station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Alcatel 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Tao Alcatel Shanghai Bell 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
Lu, Ning Alcatel Shanghai Bell 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
Zhu, Xueqing Alcatel Shanghai Bell 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shangahi 201206 / CN | 04 /
You, Mingli Alcatel Shanghai Bell 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | 05 /
Luo, Zhigang Alcatel Shanghai Bell 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2013/16] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
Yang, Tao Alcatel Shanghai Bell, 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | ||
02 /
Lu, Ning Alcatel Shanghai Bell, 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | |||
03 /
Zhu, Xueqing Alcatel Shanghai Bell, 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shangahi 201206 / CN | |||
04 /
You, Mingli Alcatel Shanghai Bell, 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | |||
05 /
Luo, Zhigang Alcatel Shanghai Bell, 388, Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao, Shanghai 201206 / CN | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001916.3 | 31.01.2006 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | CN2005123903 | 07.02.2005 Original published format: CN200510023903 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689127 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1689127 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04W52/286 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung von einem Endgerät aufgrund von relativen Bewilligungen einer nicht-bedienenden Basisstation | [2006/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for operation of a terminal based on relative grant of a non-serving base station | [2006/32] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour faire fonctionner un terminal sur la base des concessions relatives d'une station de base non-serveur | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2006 | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.01.2006 | |
AT | 17.04.2013 | ||
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 |